Ogbonna, Chinedu Sunday (CPSO#: 100053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
Fax: 7052563494
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chinedu Ogbonna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ogbonna ( CPSO# 100053)

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINEDU SUNDAY OGBONNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBONNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015