THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 19:15:27 PM
Ogbonna, Chinedu Sunday
CPSO#:
100053
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 4615
Fax: 7052563494
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHINEDU SUNDAY OGBONNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGBONNA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 27 Mar 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2015 |