skip to content

O'Donnell, Trishia Joyce

CPSO#: 84796

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University Health Services
2600 CTTC Building
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-3851 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRISHIA JOYCE O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008