THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:40:48 PM
O'Donnell, Trishia Joyce
CPSO#:
84796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310-320 Miwate Pvt
Spaces Zibi Ottawa
TeleCBT
Office# 305
Ottawa ON K1R 0E1
Phone: 6137031880
Fax: 12892031178
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Jul 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TRISHIA JOYCE O'DONNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'DONNELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2008 |