skip to content

O'Connor, Paul Williams

CPSO#: 31979

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2015

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 5, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. O' Connor has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.