THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 1:58:03 AM
O'Connor, Paul Williams
CPSO#:
31979
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P O'Connor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 6 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Aug 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: August 5, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. O' Connor has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.