skip to content

Nkansah, John

CPSO#: 23120

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Sep 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
220 Duncan Mill Road
Don Mills
Ontario
Don Mills ON  M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 391-5304
Fax: (416) 391-5305 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Nkansah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nkansah ( CPSO# 23120 )

Business Address:
318 - 220 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Phone Number: (416) 391-5304


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Barbados
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN NKANSAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NKANSAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1970