THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 5:25:25 AM
Nkansah, John
CPSO#:
23120
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Sep 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Sep 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
220 Duncan Mill Road
Don Mills
Ontario
Don Mills ON M3B 3J5
Phone: (416) 391-5304
Fax: (416) 391-5305
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN NKANSAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NKANSAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1964 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1967 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Sep 1970 |