skip to content

Desai, Nimesh

CPSO#: 77541

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4278 King St E
Tricity Eyecare
Kitchener ON  N2P 2G5
Phone: 5198048858
Fax: 5198048859 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

4278 King St E
Clear Vision Surgical
Kitchener ON  N2P 2G5
Canada
Phone: 226-499-2021
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nimesh Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 20 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIMESH DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007