THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:03:07 AM
Desai, Nimesh
CPSO#:
77541
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4278 King St E
Tricity Eyecare
Kitchener ON N2P 2G5
Phone: 5198048858
Fax: 5198048859
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NIMESH DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2007 |