skip to content

Nijhawan, Monica

CPSO#: 85469

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Bhayana, Monica (used until: 30 Oct 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monica Nijhawan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nijhawan ( CPSO# 85469 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA NIJHAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJHAWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
EL - Gynecologic Oncology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008