THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 22:49:40 PM
Nijhawan, Monica
CPSO#:
85469
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Bhayana, Monica (used until: 30 Oct 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA NIJHAWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJHAWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
EL - Gynecologic Oncology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2008 |