skip to content

Neu, Bernd Rainer

CPSO#: 29437

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Bernd Neu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Neu ( CPSO# 29437 )

Business Address:
One Medical Place
319 - 20 Wynford Drive
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 447-6176

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Management Ltd 1 High Meadow Pl North York ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 647-933-2904 email: info@recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 18 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2019