THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:54:51 PM
Neu, Bernd Rainer
CPSO#:
29437
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Bernd Neu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Pl
North York ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 647-933-2904
email: [email protected]
Date Received: 18 Jun 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:29 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |