skip to content

Navajas, Eduardo Vitor

CPSO#: 87133

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eduardo Navajas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital, Queens University, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:03 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015