THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 4:06:10 AM
Navajas, Eduardo Vitor
CPSO#:
87133
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Eduardo Navajas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Hotel Dieu Hospital, Queens University, 166 Brock Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5G2
Date Received: 25 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:03 Jul 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |