skip to content

Naqvi, Imran Haider

CPSO#: 85676

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 06 Oct 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
112 Queenston Street. Unit M2
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z4
Phone: (905) 397-8875
Fax: (905) 397-7548 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Imran Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 21 2012
Corporation Name: Dr. Imran Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 18 2014
Corporation Name: Dr. I. Naqvi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 12 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 06 Mar 2019
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 Mar 2020 Active
 

                  Dr. Imran Haider Naqvi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry,
                  only.