THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:15:17 PM
Naqvi, Imran Haider
CPSO#:
85676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
06 Oct 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Karachi, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
112 Queenston Street. Unit G3
St Catharines ON L2R 2Z4
Phone: (905) 397-8875
Fax: (905) 397-7548
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Apr 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Oct 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 05 Oct 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 06 Mar 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 27 Mar 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 27 Mar 2020 |
|
Active |