skip to content

Nalezny, Stephan John

CPSO#: 85733

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jan 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1513 Main St E
Hamilton ON  L8K 1E2
Phone: (905) 544-5719
Fax: (905) 544-1218 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Feb 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHAN JOHN NALEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NALEZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010