THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:38:37 AM
Nalezny, Stephan John
CPSO#:
85733
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1513 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8K 1E2
Phone: (905) 544-5719
Fax: (905) 544-1218
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Feb 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHAN JOHN NALEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NALEZNY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2010 |