skip to content

Nair, Krishnakumar

CPSO#: 87404

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 May 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor GW
Room GW3 548
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3194
Fax: (416) 595-1811 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2065 Finch Ave West
#212
Downsview ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: 647-477-6151
Fax: 8666926954
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Krishnakumar Nair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nair ( CPSO# 87404 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Electrophysiology/Cardiology Dept
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre-Room GW3 548
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3194


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:04 May 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 May 2011
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active
             Dr. Krishnakumar Nair may practise medicine independently in cardiology.