THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:51:59 AM
Nair, Krishnakumar
CPSO#:
87404
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor GW
Room GW3 548
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3194
Fax: (416) 595-1811
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:04 May 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 04 May 2011
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
|
Active |