skip to content

Nael, Humaira

CPSO#: 100319

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Aga Khan University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar MemorialHospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

725 Bronte St. S
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Humaira Nael Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nael ( CPSO# 100319)

Business Address:
Oakville Tragalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
Milton Kids Clinic
1 - 604 Santa Marca Boulevard
Milton ON  L9T 9L7
Phone Number: (647) 898-9390

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMAIRA NAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017