THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:55:50 PM
Nael, Humaira
CPSO#:
100319
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Bronte St S
Milton ON L9T 9M2
Phone: 905-876-5056
Fax: 289-670-2176
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Jul 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HUMAIRA NAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2017 |