skip to content

Nadel, Orli Yona

CPSO#: 86802

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: (416) 285-1825 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nadel and Stutz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stutz ( CPSO# 86686 )
Dr. O. Nadel ( CPSO# 86802 )

Business Address:
410 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 285-3323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ORLI YONA NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 28 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012