THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 0:39:05 AM
Nadel, Orli Yona
CPSO#:
86802
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 410
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 285-3323
Fax: (416) 285-1825
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ORLI YONA NADEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 May 2010 to 28 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2012 |