skip to content

Woolnough, Nicholas Rupert John

CPSO#: 101296

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
308-2250 Bovaird Dr E
Phone: 905-595-2870
Fax: 905-595-2869

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Lung Care Clinic
204 - 110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2315
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

204 - 1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rebecca Woolnough Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Woolnough ( CPSO# 95994 )
Dr. N. Woolnough ( CPSO# 101296)

Business Address:
Toronto Lung Care Clinic
Suite 204
110 Sheppard Avenue East
Willowdale ON  M2N 6Y8
Phone Number: (416) 229-2315

Business Address:
KidCrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
Citrus Medical
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Unit 107
Toronto ON  M6K 3R1

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS RUPERT JOHN WOOLNOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.