skip to content

Delva, Nicholas John

CPSO#: 31316

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jan 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Delva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Delva ( CPSO# 31316 )
Dr. M. Delva ( CPSO# 31100 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
72 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOHN DELVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1980