Myslik, Frank Ernest (CPSO#: 98576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
LHSC - VH Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Frank E Myslik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Myslik ( CPSO# 98576 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite E1-102
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK ERNEST MYSLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYSLIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014