THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:07:58 PM
Myslik, Frank Ernest
CPSO#:
98576
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
LHSC - VH Room E1 - 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Jul 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FRANK ERNEST MYSLIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MYSLIK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2014 |