skip to content

Mukherjee, Sanjib Kumar

CPSO#: 22649

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 May 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education: University of Calcutta, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2960 Drew Rd
Unit 153
Mississauga ON  L4T 0A5
Phone: (647) 741-1000
Fax: (905) 677-2507 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richmond Hill Cardiology Clinic
9625 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 237-6640
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Unit 110
385 Silverstar Blvd
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-2062
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2022
Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2023

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mukherjee ( CPSO# 22649 )

Business Address:
6-50 Rolling Hills Dr
Orangeville ON  L9W 6T6
Phone Number: 1-888-510-1816

Business Address:
2101-2045 Lake Shore Blvd W
Etobicoke ON  M8V 2Z6
Phone Number: 416-993-9919

Business Address:
105-1120 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 667-8498

Business Address:
106-1120 Finch Ave W
North York ON  M3J 3H7
Phone Number: (416) 667-8498

Business Address:
106-18 Kensington Rd
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: 416-667-8498

Business Address:
22-16700 Bayview Ave
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone Number: (289) 803-2959

Business Address:
501-18 Kensington Rd
Brampton ON  L6T 4S5
Phone Number: 416-993-9919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:24 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2004

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2004 Active
             1.    Dr.  Sanjib  Kumar  Mukherjee  may  practise  general  internal medicine,
                  including non-invasive cardiology.

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: December 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 30, 2019, Dr. Mukherjee has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)