THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:13:48 AM
Mukherjee, Sanjib Kumar
CPSO#:
22649
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Calcutta, 1954
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2960 Drew Rd
Unit 153
Mississauga ON L4T 0A5
Phone: (647) 741-1000
Fax: (905) 677-2507
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2022
Corporation Name: Sanjib Mukherjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 4 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:24 Nov 1969 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 May 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2004 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Aug 2004 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: December 20, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 30, 2019, Dr. Mukherjee has completed all elements of this SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)