skip to content

Muir, John Douglass

CPSO#: 26676

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Douglass Muir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010