THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 6:34:39 AM
Muir, John Douglass
CPSO#:
26676
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Douglass Muir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jun 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2010 |