skip to content

Morrow, Nathan Jerome

CPSO#: 17880

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Mar 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 26 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Apr 2015