THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:48:07 AM
Morrow, Nathan Jerome
CPSO#:
17880
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Mar 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 26 Aug 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1968 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1961 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jul 1964 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2015 |