skip to content

Moretto, Patricia

CPSO#: 85602

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 06 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 06 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 07 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Sep 2013