THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:49:47 AM
Moretto, Patricia
CPSO#:
85602
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
06 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Mar 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Federal University of Rio Grande Do Sul, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2006 to 06 Dec 2006
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 07 Dec 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |