skip to content

Morel, Linda Dianne

CPSO#: 30155

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
09 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Leckie, Linda Dianne (used until: 02 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Canadian Cannabis Clinic at: 5 John St., 7th Floor, Toronto, ON, M5V 3G6.
Date Received: 25 Jun 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2021