THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:27:27 AM
Morel, Linda Dianne
CPSO#:
30155
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Leckie, Linda Dianne (used until: 02 Jun 2004 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the Canadian Cannabis Clinic at: 5 John St., 7th Floor, Toronto, ON, M5V 3G6.
Date Received: 25 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 Jun 2021 |