skip to content

Morana, Corrado Giovanni

CPSO#: 29210

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morana ( CPSO# 29210 )

Business Address:
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (416) 751-6141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 10 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 10, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Corrado Giovanni
            Morana, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Morana to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                 DR. CORRADO GIOVANNI MORANA
                                          ("Dr. Morana")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Morana, certificate of registration number 29210, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that following a public complaint that raised
                  concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine, the College
                  conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1105677.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit a written report to the College at the completion of
                              the supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   A review and written summary of the following: 
                  
                              1.    CPSO Policy Medical Records:
                                    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Physicians/Policies-Guidance/Policies/Medical-Records;
                                    and
                  
                              2.    Chronic Kidney Disease - Identification, Evaluation,
                                    and 
                                    Management of Adult Patients:
                                    
                                    https://www2.gov.bc.ca/assets/gov/health/practitioner-pro/bc-guidelines/ckd-full-guideline.pdf;
                                    and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to complete this requirement within three
                        (3) months of the date I sign this Undertaking.  
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Morana, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Morana, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "C". 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr.
                              Morana's standard of practice in family medicine, the College
                              conducted an investigation. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Morana will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Morana will engage in professional education in
                                    medical recordkeeping and management of chronic kidney
                                    disease.
                  
                                    Dr. Morana's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College approximately 3 months after
                                    the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Morana, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Morana, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Morana, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Morana, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors,
                  Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one
                  another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment; and/or
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 10, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Corrado Giovanni Morana to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 10, 2019:

Following a public complaint that raised concerns about Dr. Morana’s standard of practice in family medicine, the College conducted an investigation. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Morana will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Morana will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping and management of chronic kidney disease.

Dr. Morana’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 3 months after the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.