THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:16:53 PM
Morana, Corrado Giovanni
CPSO#:
29210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1R 3A6
Phone: (416) 751-6141
Fax: (416) 751-5270
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Corrado Morana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:28 Nov 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CORRADO GIOVANNI MORANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORANA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1977 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2020 |