skip to content

Bahrgard Nikoo, Mohammad Javad

CPSO#: 83434

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Guilan University of Medical Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St.Mary's General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6428
Fax: (519) 749-6426 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Critical Care
Grand River Hospital
835 King St. West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mohammad Javad Bahrgard Nikoo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahrgard Nikoo ( CPSO# 83434 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Division of Critical Care
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6428

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 20, 2020
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 14, 2020, Grand River Hospital/St. Mary’s General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c ) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective June 20, 2020, Dr. Mohammad Javad Bahrgard Nikoo has confirmed his agreement not to exercise all his clinical privileges pending completion of an external review.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD JAVAD BAHRGARD NIKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRGARD NIKOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Bahrgard Nikoo’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Bahrgard Nikoo engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including but not limited to in relation to his inappropriate conduct at the hospitals where he worked; his interactions and sexual relationship with Ms. A, with whom he worked at the hospitals; failure to adhere to hospital workplace policies; and in his care, treatment and prescribing to Ms. A. It is also alleged that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient with respect to Ms. A. It is further alleged that Dr. Bahrgard Nikoo failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to his care of Ms. A.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): March 14 - 18, 21 - 24, 28 & 30, 2022