THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 15:34:26 PM
Bahrgard Nikoo, Mohammad Javad
CPSO#:
83434
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Guilan University of Medical Sciences, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
835 King St W
Grand River Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: June 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On December 14, 2020, Grand River Hospital/St. Mary’s General Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s.33(c ) of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that effective June 20, 2020, Dr. Mohammad Javad Bahrgard Nikoo has confirmed his agreement not to exercise all his clinical privileges pending completion of an external review.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD JAVAD BAHRGARD NIKOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHRGARD NIKOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
AVP - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2005 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2022 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 04 Apr 2023 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 15 Mar 2022
Summary:
The Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal found that Dr. Nikoo engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with a clinical colleague given his position as her immediate supervisor, their mentorship relationship, his influence over her shift schedule and her junior position on staff.
The Tribunal also found that Dr. Nikoo failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession by performing a medical procedure on his colleague despite their sexual history and close working and personal relationship, and by prescribing medication for her after her care had been transferred to another physician. This violated the College’s policy on physicians’ treatment of self, family members, or others close to them.
The Tribunal ordered that:
1. Dr. Nikoo attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Nikoo’s certificate of registration for 12 months commencing April 4, 2022;
3. Dr. Nikoo pay the College costs of $6,000 by April 14, 2022.
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. The exhibits, including the Statement of Uncontested Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): March 14, 2022 | Reprimand: April 20, 2022