skip to content

Mohamed, Adel Abdellatif Awadalla

CPSO#: 88003

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Feb 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Neonatology
19-231H - 600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7396
Fax: (416) 586-8745 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective:15 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 08 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018 Active
             Dr.  Adel  Abdellatif  Awadalla  Mohamed may practise medicine independently in
            neonatal-perinatal medicine.