THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:05:19 PM
Mohamed, Adel Abdellatif Awadalla
CPSO#:
88003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Neonatology
19-231H - 600 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7396
Fax: (416) 586-8745
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 06 Feb 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
|
Active |