skip to content

Mohamdee, Mohammed Nazerul Hassan

CPSO#: 23879

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Mohamdee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients can request a copy of their records at the clinic where they were treated. Dr. Mohamdee worked at the following Ottawa clinics: 1. Appletree Medical Clinics (14 locations) Main Office: 2573 Baseline Road Ottawa, ON K2H 7B3 Tel: 613- 482-0118 2. A1 Medical Clinics with 3 locations a) Access Medical Clinic: Unit 6 3098 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K2B 7K2 Tel: 613-596-9840 b) Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre: 3161 Strandherd Dr. Ottawa,ON K2J 5N1 Tel: 613-823-7766 c) Barrhaven Mall Medical Centre: Suite 1002 900 Greenbank Road Ottawa, ON K2J 1S8 Tel: 613- 825-0276
Instructions: Dr. Mohamdee does not have any medical charts.
Date Received: 16 Dec 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011