THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:09:59 AM
Mohamdee, Mohammed Nazerul Hassan
CPSO#:
23879
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Dublin, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. H. Mohamdee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Mohamdee does not have any medical charts.
Patients can request a copy of their records at the clinic where they were treated.
Dr. Mohamdee worked at the following Ottawa clinics:
1. Appletree Medical Clinics (14 locations)
Main Office: 2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa, ON
K2H 7B3
Tel: 613- 482-0118
2. A1 Medical Clinics with 3 locations
a) Access Medical Clinic:
Unit 6
3098 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON
K2B 7K2
Tel: 613-596-9840
b) Strandherd Crossing Medical Centre:
3161 Strandherd Dr.
Ottawa,ON
K2J 5N1
Tel: 613-823-7766
c) Barrhaven Mall Medical Centre:
Suite 1002
900 Greenbank Road
Ottawa, ON
K2J 1S8
Tel: 613- 825-0276
Date Received: 16 Dec 2011
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |