skip to content

Moffat, Murray James

CPSO#: 21323

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2022
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Dr. S.N. Chaudhry
Oshawa-Durham Sleep Laboratory
292 King St. W. 
Oshawa, ON L1J2J9
who is the legal custodian of my patient records.
Date Received: 31 May 2022


Instructions/Address:

Oshawa Durham Sleep Laboratory Clinic
292 King Street W
Oshawa ON   L1J 2J9
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2022