THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:04:01 AM
Moffat, Murray James
CPSO#:
21323
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 1968
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. S.N. Chaudhry
Oshawa-Durham Sleep Laboratory
292 King St. W.
Oshawa, ON L1J2J9
who is the legal custodian of my patient records.
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Instructions/Address:Oshawa Durham Sleep Laboratory Clinic
292 King Street W
Oshawa ON L1J 2J9
Date Received: 06 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1968 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |